NY A02585 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.
Title
Relates to entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.751 |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | print number 2585b |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to small business |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to small business |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.141 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2585a |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-04 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.304 |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S04206 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4206B