NY A02553 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the process of incorporating a village such as the contents of a petition and the filing process.
Title
Revises the process of incorporating a village such as the contents of a petition and the filing process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 2553b |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | print number 2553a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01657 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT