NY A02552 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - signed chap.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - signed chap.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to telehealth delivery of services.
Title
Relates to telehealth delivery of services.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | signed chap.6 |
2015-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-02-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-02-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2405 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.14 |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-23 | Assembly | print number 2552a |
2015-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02405 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2552A