NY A02509 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to ensure that asset forfeiture funds are used for purposes as required by law, and to eliminate the possibility of misuse of funds.
Title
Provides for greater accountability for seized assets by authorizing and directing the chief fiscal officer of a city, town, village or county to establish an asset forfeiture fund to be separately maintained; requires that proceeds from the sale of property and other moneys realized as a consequence of any forfeiture distributed to the district attorney, sheriff or other claiming agent of any county, town, city and village of which the claiming agent is a part, shall be deposited to such fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to codes | |
2009-04-23 | print number 2509a | |
2009-04-23 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-03-17 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-16 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S4751 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES