NY A02478 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for additional remedies for patients' private right of actions in residential health care facilities; allows class actions by patients, patient's legal representative, or such patient's estate.
Title
Provides for additional remedies for patients' private right of actions in residential health care facilities; allows class actions by patients, patient's legal representative, or such patient's estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.197 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.37 |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00083 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH