NY A02469 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.426
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.426
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires exempting victims of sex trafficking from the DNA databank fee.
Title
Requires exempting victims of sex trafficking from the DNA databank fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.426 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4394A |
2015-06-08 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO CODES |
2015-06-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2469a |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.100 |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04394 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2469A