NY A02458 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-27 - print number 2458a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-27 - print number 2458a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits extra charges on farmers for electric service and prohibits limitations on farmers installing and operating on-site electric generation equipment and related technology.
Title
Prohibits extra charges on farmers for electric service and prohibits limitations on farmers installing and operating on-site electric generation equipment and related technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | Assembly | print number 2458a |
2012-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2011-01-18 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S00652 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 652A