NY A02375 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that possession of a condom may not be received in evidence in any trial, hearing or proceeding as evidence of prostitution, patronizing a prostitute, promoting prostitution, permitting prostitution, maintaining a premises for prostitution, lewdness or assignation, or maintaining a bawdy house.
Title
Provides that possession of a condom may not be received in evidence in any trial, hearing or proceeding as evidence of prostitution, patronizing a prostitute, promoting prostitution, permitting prostitution, maintaining a premises for prostitution, lewdness or assignation, or maintaining a bawdy house.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-01-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |