NY A02338 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - advanced to third reading cal.748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - advanced to third reading cal.748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of state and the public service commission to study and report upon the prevalence of the disclosure by public utilities, cable television companies and cellular telephone service providers to credit reporting agencies of late payments and defaults in payment of fees and charges by consumers.
Title
Directs the department of state and the public service commission to study and report upon the prevalence of the disclosure by public utilities, cable television companies and cellular telephone service providers to credit reporting agencies of late payments and defaults in payment of fees and charges by consumers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.748 |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.202 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |