NY A02337 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the supervision of certain limited profit housing companies.
Title
Relates to the supervision of certain limited profit housing companies.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.103 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.249 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06488 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES