NY S06488 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the supervision of certain limited profit housing companies.
Title
Relates to the supervision of certain limited profit housing companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.340 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1093 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02337 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.103