NY A02321 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain municipalities receiving state aid.
Title
Relates to certain municipalities receiving state aid.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Guillermo Linares [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | tabled |
2015-10-26 | Senate | vetoed memo.202 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4257A |
2015-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.406 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | print number 2321a |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04257 (Same As) 2015-05-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2321A