NY A02243 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to compulsive gambling assistance.
Title
Relates to compulsive gambling assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.120 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.120 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.127 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.347 |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | print number 2243a |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S03394 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE