NY A02215 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - approval memo.13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - approval memo.13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pleadings in actions arising from the conduct of a business required to be licensed by the state to set forth in the pleadings that the business was licensed at the time the cause of action arose.
Title
Requires pleadings in actions arising from the conduct of a business required to be licensed by the state to set forth in the pleadings that the business was licensed at the time the cause of action arose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-03 | Senate | approval memo.13 |
2012-10-03 | Senate | signed chap.458 |
2012-09-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1311 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7092 |
2012-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.101 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.163 |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | print number 2215a |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-01-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07092 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2215A