NY A02185 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a dyslexia and dysgraphia task force; implements the findings of such task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a dyslexia and dysgraphia task force; implements the findings of such task force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-05-24Senate3RD READING CAL.1488
2022-05-24SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S441C
2022-05-11SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2022-05-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2022-05-11Assemblypassed assembly
2022-05-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.104
2022-05-10Assemblyrules report cal.104
2022-05-10Assemblyreported
2022-05-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2022-05-04Assemblyprint number 2185b
2022-05-04Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2022-04-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2022-04-18Assemblyprint number 2185a
2022-04-18Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to education
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to education
2021-01-14Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S00441 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2185B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A2185
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02185&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02185
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02185&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02185A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02185&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02185B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02185&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02185&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02185&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02185&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A2185#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback