NY S00441 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2185B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a dyslexia and dysgraphia task force; implements the findings of such task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a dyslexia and dysgraphia task force; implements the findings of such task force.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A2185B
2022-05-24SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1488
2022-05-24SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2022-05-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 441C
2022-05-04SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2022-04-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 441B
2022-04-19SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2021-11-16SenateAMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 441
2021-06-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 441A
2021-06-04SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A02185 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback