NY A02157 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agency websites to be mobile friendly.
Title
Requires state agency websites to be mobile friendly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.440 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 2157a |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |