NY A02080 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - signed chap.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - signed chap.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exemptions for improvements to real property meeting certification standards for green buildings.
Title
Relates to exemptions for improvements to real property meeting certification standards for green buildings.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | signed chap.14 |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-03-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.93 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2034 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.18 |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.18 |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S02034 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2080