NY A02061 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mercantile establishments and the defense of lawful detention.
Title
Relates to mercantile establishments and the defense of lawful detention.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05820 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION