NY A02050 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - committed to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - committed to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a social services official may not recover assistance properly paid as permitted where a recipient or former recipient of such assistance was required to participate in a work experience program without first crediting against such recovery the number of hours that such person actually participated in a work experience program multiplied by the higher of the applicable state or federal minimum wage.
Title
Provides that a social services official may not recover assistance properly paid as permitted where a recipient or former recipient of such assistance was required to participate in a work experience program without first crediting against such recovery the number of hours that such person actually participated in a work experience program multiplied by the higher of the applicable state or federal minimum wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to social services |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.98 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.467 |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01120 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES