NY A02005 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - print number 2005b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts into law major components of legislation necessary to implement the state public protection and general government budget for the 2019-2020 state fiscal year; relates to the protection of personal privacy of public employees; prohibits the disclosure of such employees' home addresses, personal telephone numbers, personal cell phone numbers, and personal e-mail addresses with certain exceptions (Part E); relates to the expiration of public arbitration panels (Part F); relates to a class one reassessment exemption in a special assessing unit that is not a city (Part J); relates to extending the provisions relating to expanding opportunities for service-disabled veteran-owned business enterprises to March 31, 2024 (Part L); extends various criminal justice and public safety programs (Part O); relates to increasing certain fees collected by the office of court administration for criminal history records and other electronically kept data (Part DD); authorizes the use of centralized services by public authorities and public benefit corporations to acquire energy products as a centralized service from the office of general services; relates to the effectiveness of chapter 410 of the laws of 2009, relating to authorizing the aggregate purchases of energy for state agencies, institutions, local governments, public authorities and public benefit corporations; relates to the effectiveness of chapter 97 of the laws of 2011, providing certain centralized service to political subdivisions and extending the authority of the commissioner of general services to aggregate purchases of energy for state agencies and political subdivisions (Part GG); relates to value limitations on contracts for certain public work during emergencies and extending certain provisions of law relating thereto (Part HH); relates to Suffolk county charging block fees (Part SS); relates to creating the state office of the utility consumer advocate (Part VV); establishes the utility intervener account (Part WW); authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; and updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites (Part XX); makes provisions permanent concerning mandatory settlement conferences in residential foreclosure actions (Part YY); authorizes the state comptroller to oversee certain contracts of the research foundation of the state university of New York (Part ZZ); repeals sections of law relating to the lease or sale of real property for park purposes (Part AAA); extends the operation and administration of legislative commissions (Part BBB); relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies (Part CCC).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts into law major components of legislation necessary to implement the state public protection and general government budget for the 2019-2020 state fiscal year; relates to the protection of personal privacy of public employees; prohibits the disclosure of such employees' home addresses, personal telephone numbers, personal cell phone numbers, and personal e-mail addresses with certain exceptions (Part E); relates to the expiration of public arbitration panels (Part F); relates to a class one reassessment exemption in a special assessing unit that is not a city (Part J); relates to extending the provisions relating to expanding opportunities for service-disabled veteran-owned business enterprises to March 31, 2024 (Part L); extends various criminal justice and public safety programs (Part O); relates to increasing certain fees collected by the office of court administration for criminal history records and other electronically kept data (Part DD); authorizes the use of centralized services by public authorities and public benefit corporations to acquire energy products as a centralized service from the office of general services; relates to the effectiveness of chapter 410 of the laws of 2009, relating to authorizing the aggregate purchases of energy for state agencies, institutions, local governments, public authorities and public benefit corporations; relates to the effectiveness of chapter 97 of the laws of 2011, providing certain centralized service to political subdivisions and extending the authority of the commissioner of general services to aggregate purchases of energy for state agencies and political subdivisions (Part GG); relates to value limitations on contracts for certain public work during emergencies and extending certain provisions of law relating thereto (Part HH); relates to Suffolk county charging block fees (Part SS); relates to creating the state office of the utility consumer advocate (Part VV); establishes the utility intervener account (Part WW); authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; and updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites (Part XX); makes provisions permanent concerning mandatory settlement conferences in residential foreclosure actions (Part YY); authorizes the state comptroller to oversee certain contracts of the research foundation of the state university of New York (Part ZZ); repeals sections of law relating to the lease or sale of real property for park purposes (Part AAA); extends the operation and administration of legislative commissions (Part BBB); relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies (Part CCC).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Assemblyprint number 2005b
2019-03-11Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2019-02-19Assemblyprint number 2005a
2019-02-19Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01505 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 1505B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback