NY A01963 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends procedures required for the custodial interrogation of children to provide additional protections and for taking juveniles and sixteen and seventeen year olds into custody.
Title
Amends procedures required for the custodial interrogation of children to provide additional protections and for taking juveniles and sixteen and seventeen year olds into custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | recommitted to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.58 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.211 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.211 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01099 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE