NY A01962 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - print number 1962a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain health insurance issuers to certify that at least a majority of prescription drug rebates are provided to patients at the point of sale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain health insurance issuers to certify that at least a majority of prescription drug rebates are provided to patients at the point of sale.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-06Assemblyprint number 1962a
2024-02-06Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to insurance
2023-01-23Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S02393 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback