NY A01942 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities official functions.
Title
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities official functions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.79 |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |