NY A01925 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - held for consideration in health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - held for consideration in health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the reasonable charge for electronic copies of medical records and patient information.
Title
Establishes the reasonable charge for electronic copies of medical records and patient information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01294 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES