NY A01921 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - advanced to third reading cal.333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - advanced to third reading cal.333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in the issuance of certain insurance policies based upon inquiries in which loss or damage is revealed.
Title
Prohibits discrimination in the issuance of certain insurance policies based upon inquiries in which loss or damage is revealed.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Asm. Nancy Calhoun [R] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Francisco Moya [D] | Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Keith Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.333 |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.83 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.143 |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |