NY A01889 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for failure to execute and file satisfied judgments of $5,000 or more with court clerk from $100 to $500.
Title
Increases penalties for failure to execute and file satisfied judgments of $5,000 or more with court clerk from $100 to $500.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.169 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | print number 1889b |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-05-11 | Assembly | print number 1889a |
2012-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00438 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES