NY A01856 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the offer of state-owned real property determined not to be needed for state purposes to the municipality in which it is located, or the county if the municipality declines; permits other disposition of the property if the municipality and county both decline.
Title
Provides for the offer of state-owned real property determined not to be needed for state purposes to the municipality in which it is located, or the county if the municipality declines; permits other disposition of the property if the municipality and county both decline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-14 | Senate | tabled |
2013-11-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.241 |
2013-11-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1177 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1445A |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.346 |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01445 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1856