NY A01824 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the court to grant post-conviction motions to vacate a judgment when the issue raised upon such motion is ineffective assistance of counsel in certain cases in which the court would otherwise be required to deny the motion.
Title
Permits the court to grant post-conviction motions to vacate a judgment when the issue raised upon such motion is ineffective assistance of counsel in certain cases in which the court would otherwise be required to deny the motion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.84 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.384 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06661 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES