NY A01820 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Urban Development Corporation to create a subsidiary corporation for the purpose of the further planning, design, and oversight of the Atlantic Yards land use improvement and civic project.
Title
Authorizes the Urban Development Corporation to create a subsidiary corporation for the purpose of the further planning, design, and oversight of the Atlantic Yards land use improvement and civic project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.80 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.456 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.456 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01597 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES