NY A01809 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to take action when high risk areas of lead poisoning are designated; requires the commissioner of health to provide written notice instructing such condition be discontinued within a specified period of time.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to take action when high risk areas of lead poisoning are designated; requires the commissioner of health to provide written notice instructing such condition be discontinued within a specified period of time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Senate | approval memo.16 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | signed chap.411 |
2017-11-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.714 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1200A |
2017-05-23 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1809a |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-15 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.31 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to health |