NY A01788 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts wholesalers from filing annual information returns with the commissioner of taxation and finance for sales made to and from farm wineries.
Title
Exempts wholesalers from filing annual information returns with the commissioner of taxation and finance for sales made to and from farm wineries.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. William Boyland [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01759 (Same As) 2012-05-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE