NY A01776 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a study by the department of corrections and community supervision pertaining to the treatment of aging prison populations.
Title
Authorizes a study by the department of corrections and community supervision pertaining to the treatment of aging prison populations.
Sponsors
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.133 |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.268 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03396 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE