NY A01773 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s1443b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s1443b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to state gaming commission operational licenses.
Title
Relates to state gaming commission operational licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s1443b |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.518 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 1773c |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 1773b |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | print number 1773a |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S01443 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.105