NY A01757 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To relieve businesses from the "hidden" taxes associated with fees required for various administrative filings with the state.
Title
An act to repeal certain provisions of the business corporation law, the executive law and the not-for-profit corporation law, in relation to certain fees collected by the department of state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2010-01-06 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2009-01-12 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S6689 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS