NY A01720 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - print number 1720a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - print number 1720a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the nurse loan repayment program; authorizes the commissioner to award loan repayment awards to nurses serving in underserved areas or nursing homes.
Title
Establishes the nurse loan repayment program; authorizes the commissioner to award loan repayment awards to nurses serving in underserved areas or nursing homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Assembly | print number 1720a |
2014-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01468 (Same As) 2014-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1468A