NY A01690 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants to the department of environmental conservation for permits to disclose information concerning other permits held and/or revoked, enforcement actions, criminal convictions, fees or fines owed, and other information relating to compliance by the applicant or any corporation of which he or she is an officer, director, or large stockholder with state, federal, or foreign environmental laws or regulations and certain other laws.
Title
Requires applicants to the department of environmental conservation for permits to disclose information concerning other permits held and/or revoked, enforcement actions, criminal convictions, fees or fines owed, and other information relating to compliance by the applicant or any corporation of which he or she is an officer, director, or large stockholder with state, federal, or foreign environmental laws or regulations and certain other laws.
Sponsors
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.52 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.52 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.380 |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04900 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION