NY A01687 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the exclusion of coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint; provides that no insurer licensed or permitted by the superintendent to provide liability coverage to rental property owners shall exclude coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the exclusion of coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint; provides that no insurer licensed or permitted by the superintendent to provide liability coverage to rental property owners shall exclude coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.50 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.102 |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00088 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE