NY A01683 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Safeguards cash accounts for people with developmental disabilities in a facility under the control of the commissioner of mental health, the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities and the commissioner of alcoholism and substance abuse services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safeguards cash accounts for people with developmental disabilities in a facility under the control of the commissioner of mental health, the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities and the commissioner of alcoholism and substance abuse services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-03-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-01-17Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S06433 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback