NY A01650 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the "New York state civil war 150th anniversary commemoration commission" to plan and execute an organized series of reenactment tourism events.
Title
Creates the "New York state civil war 150th anniversary commemoration commission" to plan and execute an organized series of reenactment tourism events.
Sponsors
Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
Asm. Claudia Tenney [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-02-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1650b |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.75 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.366 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | print number 1650a |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S00197 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION