NY A01619 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to coverage for eating disorders; requires comparable coverage for adults and children with eating disorders; defines eating disorder.
Title
Relates to coverage for eating disorders; requires comparable coverage for adults and children with eating disorders; defines eating disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.241 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.463 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3101 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.55 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03101 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled