NY A01571 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.
Title
Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | tabled |
2015-10-26 | Senate | vetoed memo.201 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1824 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.350 |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01824 (Same As) 2015-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1571