NY A01547 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires places of public accommodation, resort or amusement that operate televisions during regular hours of operation to provide closed captioning on certain televisions upon request.
Title
Requires places of public accommodation, resort or amusement that operate televisions during regular hours of operation to provide closed captioning on certain televisions upon request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.119 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.68 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03717 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES