NY A01533 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides minimum basic training related to handling emergency situations involving individuals with any physical and/or developmental disability to all firefighters.
Title
Provides minimum basic training related to handling emergency situations involving individuals with any physical and/or developmental disability to all firefighters.
Sponsors
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.387 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | print number 1533a |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03190 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3190A