NY S03190 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3190A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides minimum basic training related to handling emergency situations involving individuals with any physical and/or developmental disability to all firefighters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides minimum basic training related to handling emergency situations involving individuals with any physical and/or developmental disability to all firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 3190A
2024-05-28SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-03-18SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2023-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.637
2023-01-30SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A01533 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback