NY A01522 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 1522b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 1522b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to gifted and talented pupils with special needs.
Title
Relates to gifted and talented pupils with special needs.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] |
Asm. David McDonough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Assembly | print number 1522b |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-05-03 | Assembly | print number 1522a |
2013-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01875 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1875B