NY A01515 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-31 - print number 1515a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-31 - print number 1515a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services.
Title
Establishes a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-31 | Assembly | print number 1515a |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01293 (Same As) 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1293A