NY A01514 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Rushford, county of Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Title
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Rushford, county of Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.476 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.476 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-03 | Assembly | print number 1514a |
2024-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reference changed to local governments |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | committed to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.46 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.678 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.678 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01119 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1119A