NY A01498 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to assault of certain persons providing direct patient care in a health care setting; provides that such assault shall be a class D felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to assault of certain persons providing direct patient care in a health care setting; provides that such assault shall be a class D felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.534
2014-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.534
2014-06-19Assemblyreported
2014-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-06-11Assemblyprint number 1498b
2014-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2014-01-30Assemblyprint number 1498a
2014-01-30Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2013-01-09Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S01089 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback