NY A01465 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of the empire state music production tax credit.
Title
Relates to the creation of the empire state music production tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | print number 1465a |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04549 (Same As) 2016-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 4549A